Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Ferreira da Rocha, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castelo Branco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1727BornLisboa
31 May 176134.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Aug 178255.3SelectedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
16 Dec 178255.6ConfirmedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
24 Feb 178355.8Ordained BishopBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
7 Mar 178355.9InstalledBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
27 Aug 181487.3DiedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Vicente Ferreira da Rocha:
Bishop Vicente Ferreira da Rocha O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Castelo Branco

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,497
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016