Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Campos

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Febiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1904Born
22 Aug 192622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
28 Aug 195450.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
28 Aug 195450.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
28 Oct 195450.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
9 Aug 196965.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António de Campos
Bishop António de Campos (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcobaça

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast