Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henrique Cardinal de Portugal

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Évora

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1512BornLisbon
30 Apr 153321.2AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
13 Apr 153927.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
24 Sep 154028.6AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
16 Dec 154533.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 154735.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
21 Jun 156452.4AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Nov 156957.8ResignedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
15 Dec 157462.9AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
4 Jul 157866.4ResignedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
31 Jan 158068.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Henrique de Portugal:
Cardinal Henrique de Portugal (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Évora

  • a bishop for 40.8 years
  • a cardinal for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1545
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013