Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Andrea Correa, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1679³BornLisboa, Portugal
22 Dec 170323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
9 Dec 172646.9AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
29 Dec 172647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
Aug 1738³58.5DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Andrea Correa:
Bishop Francesco Andrea Correa Sch. P. (born , died Aug 1738) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015