Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José João dos Santos Marcos

Bishop of Beja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1949 BornMonte Perobolso
23 Jun 197424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
10 Oct 201465.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Beja, Portugal
23 Nov 201465.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Beja, Portugal
3 Nov 201667.2SucceededBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José João dos Santos Marcos
Bishop José João dos Santos Marcos (born ) Bishop of Beja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Beja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2014
  • c1: CB, 10 Oct 2014
  • ob: CB, 17 Oct 2014
  • c2: CB, 13 Nov 2014
  • c34: CB, 23 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,322
  • s: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Nov 2016