Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop EstÍv„o Anes de Vasconcelos

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1230¹Born
31 May 128656.4AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
9 Aug 128757.6DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for EstÍv„o Anes de Vasconcelos
Bishop EstÍv„o Anes de Vasconcelos (born 1230, died ) Bishop of Lisboa

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast