Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teobaldo de Castillon

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1283Born
27 Apr 131330.3AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
18 Jan 131835.0AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
17 Mar 134865.2AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
28 May 135673.4DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Teobaldo de Castillon
Bishop Teobaldo de Castillon (born 1283, died ) Bishop of Lisboa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 506, and Page 537
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 516
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast