Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Henrique Correa da Gama

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Constantina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1684³BornLisboa, Portugal
23 Dec 172440.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 172540.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 172743.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantina
17 Aug 172743.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Henrique Correa da Gama:
Bishop José Henrique Correa da Gama (born ) Titular Bishop of Constantina

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015