Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge de Quemado (Queimada), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548²Born
1 Feb 159951.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
1 Feb 159951.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
28 Nov 159951.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
29 May 161870.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jorge de Quemado (Queimada)
Bishop Jorge de Quemado (Queimada) O.S.A. (born 1548, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldea Gallega de Ribatejo, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopN.S. de Graca, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 187
  • b: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast