Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildo Augusto dos Santos Lopes Fortes

Bishop of Mindelo, Cape Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1964 Born
29 Nov 199227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Jan 201146.1AppointedBishop of Mindelo, Cape Verde
3 Apr 201146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mindelo, Cape Verde
10 Apr 201146.3InstalledBishop of Mindelo, Cape Verde

MicroData Summary for Ildo Augusto dos Santos Lopes Fortes
Bishop Ildo Augusto dos Santos Lopes Fortes (born ) Bishop of Mindelo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola di Sal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mindelo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,984
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast