Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Carlos Josť Cardinal de Noronha e Abranches

Deceased

Priest of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1744BornLisbon
16 May 180358.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Sep 180358.8DiedPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Miguel Carlos Josť de Noronha e Abranches:
Cardinal Miguel Carlos Josť de Noronha e Abranches (born , died ) Priest of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a cardinal for .3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013