Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Portalegre-Castelo Branco

Dioecesis Portalegrensis-Castri Albi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 18 July 1956
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 9,149 (3,533 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.portalegre-castelobranco.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Bispado, Apartado 20, 7301-901 Portalegre CODEX, Portugal
  • Telephone: 245.30.94.80
  • Fax: 245.20.81.90

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Portalegre
2 April 1550ErectedArchdiocese of Évora
Diocese of Guarda
Diocese of Portalegre (erected)
30 September 1881Territory AddedDiocese of Castelo Branco (suppressed)
Diocese of Elvas (suppressed)
Diocese of Portalegre
Diocese of Portalegre-Castelo Branco
18 July 1956Name ChangedDiocese of Portalegre Diocese of Portalegre-Castelo Branco

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Portalegre
1949319,080348,18491.6%1591592,006144154ap1951
Diocese of Portalegre-Castelo Branco
1969350,524354,27598.9%178191971,77936197106ap1971
1980289,900292,20099.2%140171571,84623177161ap1981
1990299,500302,00099.2%122171392,15424206158ap1991
1999258,762260,38099.4%98131112,331713201162ap2000
2000256,840258,45899.4%99101092,356710192161ap2001
2001254,909256,52799.4%103141172,178617167162ap2002
2002253,165254,78399.4%103141172,1631216180162ap2003
2003251,324252,94299.4%99151142,2041215194162ap2004
2004248,923250,54199.4%89151042,3931215179162ap2005
2013228,186231,80498.4%7113842,7161313127161ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.1.9, 15 Apr 2017; Data: 21 May 2017