Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Bonifacio Coelho

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1717BornCouilhao
5 Mar 175739.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Mar 175739.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 177053.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Aug 177053.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
14 Oct 177053.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
178062.6SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
20 Jun 178063.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ⁶ Before ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bonifacio Coelho:
Archbishop Antonio Bonifacio Coelho (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250, and Page 257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015