Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaudêncio José Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1830Born
10 Jun 185423.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 188756.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Mar 188756.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
1 May 188756.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
22 Mar 188857.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Portalegre, Portugal
1 Jun 188857.6ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Portalegre, Portugal
2 Nov 190878.0DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Gaudêncio José Pereira
Archbishop Gaudêncio José Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCristavao, Diocese of Viseu
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,105
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 388, and Page 463
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017