Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Atayde de Lima Perera

Deceased

Bishop of ┴vila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹BornLisboa
1624²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 164445.9AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
26 Feb 164546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Oct 165455.8AppointedBishop of ┴vila, Spain
17 Feb 165657.1DiedBishop of ┴vila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Atayde de Lima Perera:
Bishop Bernardo Atayde de Lima Perera (died ) Bishop of ┴vila

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 99
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 174, Number 1,083

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014