Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António dos Reis Rodrigues

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Bishop of Madarsuma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1918BornVila Nova de Ourém
1 Mar 194728.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 196648.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Oct 196648.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Madarsuma
8 Jan 196748.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madarsuma
5 Sep 199880.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 Feb 200990.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António dos Reis Rodrigues:
Bishop António dos Reis Rodrigues (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013