Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Santa Rosa de Viterbo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1693³BornCrato, Portugal
22 May 171723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jul 174248.6SelectedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
26 Nov 174249.0ConfirmedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
17 Feb 174349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
21 Mar 175056.3DiedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Santa Rosa de Viterbo:
Bishop Francesco de Santa Rosa de Viterbo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,456
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015