Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio da Madre de Deus Galvão, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1697³BornLisboa, Portugal
7 Jun 172124.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
20 Dec 172124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jan 175052.6SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
16 Mar 175052.8ConfirmedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
6 Sep 175053.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Jun 175154.0InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 176466.8DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antônio da Madre de Deus Galvão:
Bishop Antônio da Madre de Deus Galvão O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015