Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel da Silva Frances

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Thagaste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹Born
24 Sep 170857.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Sep 170857.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
10 Mar 170958.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
12 Oct 172776.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel da Silva Frances
Bishop Manoel da Silva Frances (born 1651, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopSanta Cruz do Castello, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 372
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Apr 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,709, Number 7
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,436
  • c34: CB, 24 Nov 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast