Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Bento Cardinal Rodrigues da Silva

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1800BornVila Nova de Gaia
11 Mar 182625.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 184544.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Nov 184544.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
22 Feb 184645.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
30 Oct 185150.8SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Coimbra, Portugal
15 Mar 185251.2ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Coimbra, Portugal
18 Mar 185857.2AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Jun 185857.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Sep 186968.8DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Bento Rodrigues da Silva:
Cardinal Manuel Bento Rodrigues da Silva (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 213, and Page 346
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013