Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo de São José, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1701³Born
15 May 175250.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
15 May 175250.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
10 Sep 175250.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
2 Feb 177371.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo de São José
Bishop Jerónimo de São José O.S.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopÉvora, Archdiocese of Évora

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 408
  • bd/bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 40
  • b/c2+: CB, 20 Feb 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast