Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lourenšo Rodrigues (Martins de Barbudo)

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1347AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
23 May 1356AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
25 Aug 1358AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
19 Jun 1364DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Lourenšo Rodrigues (Martins de Barbudo)
Bishop Lourenšo Rodrigues (Martins de Barbudo) (died ) Bishop of Lisboa

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 235, and Page 196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 507
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast