Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio da Arrábida, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Anemurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1771Born
9 Apr 182755.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
11 May 182856.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
11 Apr 185078.5DiedTitular Bishop of Anemurium

MicroData Summary for Antônio da Arrábida
Bishop Antônio da Arrábida O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Anemurium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Portugal

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 74
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast