Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Noronha

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1396¹Born
11 Jan 141923.0AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
10 Mar 142327.1AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
12 Aug 1452³56.6DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Noronha
Archbishop Pedro de Noronha (born 1396, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 507, and Page 236
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast