Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Guarda

Dioecesis Aegitaniensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Manuel da Rocha Felício, Bishop
  • António dos Santos, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 6th Century
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 6,759 (2,610 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedaguarda.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Rua do Encontro 35, 6300-704 Guarda, Portugal
  • Telephone: 271.212.959
  • Fax: 271.223.769

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Guarda (erected)
10 November 1394Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Guarda (from Santiago de Compostela)
2 April 1550Territory LostArchdiocese of Évora
Diocese of Guarda
Diocese of Portalegre (erected)
30 September 1881Territory AddedDiocese of Pinhel (suppressed) Diocese of Guarda

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949424,000424,51299.9%31263181,33310170356ap1951
1970374,946375,25499.9%302163181,17921285358ap1971
1980327,000328,00099.7%235192541,28724190360ap1981
1990290,000295,00098.3%197202171,33629119362ap1991
1999250,000265,00094.3%173161891,32219142361ap2000
2000250,000265,00094.3%168151831,36617137361ap2001
2001250,000265,00094.3%169151841,35817150361ap2002
2002250,000265,00094.3%171171881,32920136361ap2003
2003250,000265,00094.3%169171861,34435130361ap2004
2004250,000260,00096.2%160171771,41229121361ap2005
2006250,700260,70096.2%150141641,52816127361ap2007
2013254,300265,00096.0%127151421,7901826104361ap2014
2016251,100261,70095.9%114161301,9311727100361ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.1, 30 Dec 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2018