Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Freire Gameiro de Sousa

Deceased

Bishop of Aveiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1727BornLisboa
28 Sep 177346.6SelectedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
18 Apr 177447.1ConfirmedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
25 Sep 177447.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
3 Nov 179972.7DiedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Freire Gameiro de Sousa:
Bishop António Freire Gameiro de Sousa (born , died ) Bishop of Aveiro

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 110
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,490
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015