Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriao da Costa e Gouveia

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Bishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1678³BornLisboa
23 Sep 172445.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
23 Dec 172446.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
19 Dec 174062.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
19 Dec 174062.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
19 Feb 174162.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
23 Oct 174263.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valeriao da Costa e Gouveia:
Bishop Valeriao da Costa e Gouveia (born Dec 1678, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 17.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250, and Page 452
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,072
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015