Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Rafael de Mendonça, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1717³BornLisboa
17 May 173922.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Orden de San Jerónimo
30 Apr 174123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerónimo
21 Mar 177153.8SelectedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
13 Jun 177154.1SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
17 Jun 177154.1ConfirmedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
29 Jul 177154.2ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
10 Nov 177154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
6 Jun 179376.0DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Rafael de Mendonça
Bishop João Rafael de Mendonça O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 338, and Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016