Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal de Saldanha da Gama

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1723BornLisboa
1739²15.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 175632.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon
5 Apr 175632.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jul 175835.1SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
28 May 175936.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
28 May 175936.0AppointedCardinal-Priest
5 Aug 175936.2Ordained BishopPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1 Nov 177653.4DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Saldanha da Gama: VIAF:99888587
Francisco Cardinal de Saldanha da Gama (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1756
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,077
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015