Catholic-Hierarchy DC

António Cardinal Ribeiro

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana

Vicar Apostolic of Portugal, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1928BornGandarela de Basta
5 Jul 195325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
3 Jul 196739.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Jul 196739.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
17 Sep 196739.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava
10 May 197143.0AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Jan 197243.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Portugal, Military
5 Mar 197344.8Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197344.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana
24 Mar 199869.8DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Ribeiro:
António Cardinal Ribeiro (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014