Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lourenço de Castro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹Born
163715.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Mar 167149.2SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
18 May 167149.3ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
26 Jul 167149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
1 Dec 168159.9AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
10 Aug 168462.6DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lourenço de Castro
Bishop Lourenço de Castro O.P. (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87, and Page 270
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,671, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast