Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Rafael Maria d’Assunçâo Pitinho, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1874BornVaratojo, Portugal
3 Apr 189722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Dec 192046.4AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
16 Dec 192046.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Augusta
31 May 192146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augusta
15 Nov 193561.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
5 May 194065.7ResignedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
5 May 194065.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
22 Nov 195985.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Rafael Maria d’Assunçâo Pitinho:
Bishop Joaquim Rafael Maria d’Assunçâo Pitinho O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 38
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013