Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Gómez Barroso

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1325¹Born
14 Aug 134823.6AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
25 Aug 135833.6AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
23 Jul 136439.5AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
4 Jun 136944.4AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Oct 136944.8InstalledArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
30 May 137146.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 May 137146.4ResignedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
30 May 137146.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
2 Jun 1374³49.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gómez Barroso
Pedro Cardinal Gómez Barroso (born 1325, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Sainte-Praxéde, Monastery, near Avignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 444, and Page 196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 507, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast