Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Visco

Archbishop of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1948 Born
14 Apr 197324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pozzuoli, Italy
5 Apr 200758.6AppointedBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
2 Jun 200758.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
24 Jun 200758.9InstalledBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
30 Apr 201364.7AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Visco
Archbishop Salvatore Visco (born ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Capua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,428
  • ab: CB, 30 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast