Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leonardo Cardinal Sandri

Prefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1943 Born
2 Dec 196724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Jul 199753.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aemona
22 Jul 199753.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
11 Oct 199753.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aemona
1 Mar 200056.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México
16 Sep 200056.8AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
9 Jun 200763.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
24 Nov 200764.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
24 Nov 200764.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 200764.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
19 May 201874.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Sandri (VIAF: 306356842)
Leonardo Cardinal Sandri (born ) Prefect of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Oriental Churches.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,158
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast