Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Caffarra

Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1938 BornSamboseto di Busseto
2 Jul 196123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fidenza, Italy
8 Sep 199557.2AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
21 Oct 199557.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
16 Dec 200365.5AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
15 Feb 200465.7InstalledArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
24 Mar 200667.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200667.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini
24 Jun 200668.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini
27 Oct 201577.4RetiredArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Caffarra
Carlo Cardinal Caffarra (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bologna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,623
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016