Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Foresti

Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1923 Born
7 Apr 194622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
12 Dec 197451.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
12 Dec 197451.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Plestia
12 Jan 197551.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plestia
2 Apr 197652.9AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
7 Apr 198359.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Brescia, Italy
15 Jun 198360.1InstalledBishop of Brescia, Italy
19 Dec 199875.6RetiredBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Foresti
Archbishop Bruno Foresti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTavernola Bergamasca, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni Bianco, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Brescia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc/i: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Jul 2019

Quantcast