Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Paglia

President of the Pontifical Academy for Life


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1945 Born
15 Mar 197024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
4 Mar 200054.8AppointedBishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy
2 Apr 200054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy
16 Apr 200054.9InstalledBishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy
26 Jun 201267.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
26 Jun 201267.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
28 Feb 201367.8CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
16 Mar 201367.9ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
15 Aug 201671.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life
1 Sep 201671.3CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Paglia (VIAF: 76437627)
Archbishop Vincenzo Paglia (born ) President of Life

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoville Ernica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Academy for Life.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,743
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast