Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Asa Schleck, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Titular Archbishop of Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1925BornMilwaukee, WI, USA
22 Dec 195126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
10 Feb 199569.6AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
10 Feb 199569.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Africa
1 Apr 199569.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Africa
200074.5RetiredOfficial of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
12 Jul 201186.0DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

MicroData Summary for Charles Asa Schleck:
Archbishop Charles Asa Schleck C.S.C. (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Evangelization of Peoples

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,504
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014