Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Ventura

Apostolic Nuncio to France

Titular Archbishop of Equilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1944 BornBorgosatollo, Italy
14 Jun 196924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
25 Mar 199550.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Equilium
25 Mar 199550.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
25 Mar 199550.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
25 Mar 199550.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
29 Apr 199550.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Equilium
25 Mar 199954.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
22 Jun 200156.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Canada
22 Sep 200964.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ventura:
Archbishop Luigi Ventura (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of France

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to France.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014