Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eduardo Cardinal Martínez Somalo

Chamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Gesù


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1927 BornBaños de Río Tobía, Spain
19 Mar 195023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
12 Nov 197548.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thagora
12 Nov 197548.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
13 Dec 197548.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thagora
5 May 197952.1AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
28 Jun 198861.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Gesù
28 Jun 198861.2Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 198861.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
21 Jan 199264.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
5 Apr 199366.0AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
9 Jan 199971.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Gesù
4 Jun 200073.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Gesù
11 Feb 200476.9RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
4 Apr 200780.0RetiredChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Martínez Somalo:
Eduardo Cardinal Martínez Somalo (born ) Chamberlain Emeritus of Apostolic Chamber

Please contact the Cardinal through the Apostolic Chamber.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • i: Bollettino, 23 May 2000

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014