Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Fabio D’Onorio, O.S.B.

Archbishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1940 BornVeroli
30 Sep 196222.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Jun 196625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Apr 198342.7SelectedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
19 Jun 198342.8ConfirmedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
13 Apr 200463.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Minturnae
16 May 200463.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Minturnae
20 Sep 200767.1AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Fabio D’Onorio:
Archbishop Bernardo Fabio D’Onorio O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop of Gaeta

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gaeta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,595
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013