Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Ghidelli

Archbishop Emeritus of Lanciano-Ortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1934 BornOffanengo
28 Jun 195824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
25 Nov 200066.6AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy
14 Jan 200166.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy
11 Oct 201076.5RetiredArchbishop of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ghidelli:
Archbishop Carlo Ghidelli (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lanciano-Ortona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lanciano-Ortona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013