Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Paul VI

St. Giovanni Battista Enrico Antonio Maria Montini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1897Born
29 May 192022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
13 Dec 193740.2AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
29 Nov 195255.1AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
1 Nov 195457.0AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Dec 195457.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Jan 195557.2InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
15 Dec 195861.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195861.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
21 Jun 196365.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Jun 196365.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Aug 197880.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Oct 2014Beatified
14 Oct 2018Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Giovanni Battista Enrico Antonio Maria Montini (VIAF: 61533321)
Pope St. Giovanni Battista Enrico Antonio Maria Montini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcesio, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained PriestBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCastel Gandolfo, Castelgandolfo, Suburbicarian See of Albano
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's Basilica, Grotto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • beat: Bollettino, 10 May 2014
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 16, and Page 36
  • cano: Bollettino, 19 May 2018
  • i: AM, 9 Feb 2019
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 264, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 335, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Apr 2019

Quantcast