Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Patriarca

Bishop Emeritus of Monze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1937 BornVarese, Italy
28 Jun 196225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Jun 199961.9AppointedBishop of Monze, Zambia
19 Sep 199962.2Ordained BishopBishop of Monze, Zambia
10 Feb 201476.6RetiredBishop of Monze, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Emilio Patriarca:
Bishop Emilio Patriarca (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Monze

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Monze.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,617
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 10 Feb 2014