Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Kakubi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbarara, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1929Born
11 Jun 196030.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mbarara, Uganda
26 Jun 196939.7AppointedBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
1 Aug 196939.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
23 Nov 199162.1ResignedBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
11 Feb 201686.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbarara, Uganda

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Kakubi (VIAF: 170485787)
Bishop John Baptist Kakubi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbarara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirundama

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017