Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Pagani

Deceased

Archbishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1921Born
3 Jun 194423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Jan 197250.6AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
22 Jan 197250.6AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
13 Feb 197250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
19 Mar 197250.8InstalledBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
21 Nov 198160.5AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
21 Nov 198160.5AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
30 Sep 198665.3AppointedArchbishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy
12 Mar 198866.8DiedArchbishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Pagani (VIAF: 81092959)
Archbishop Cesare Pagani (born , died ) Archbishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDergano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Città della Pieve
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, San Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Città della Pieve

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc/i: AM, 10 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast