Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Rossi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy

Titular Bishop of Aliezira

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1903Born
30 May 193127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Apr 196359.8AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
26 May 196359.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
29 Nov 196966.4ResignedBishop of Tortona, Italy
29 Nov 196966.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aliezira
197167.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
18 Dec 197269.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Rossi
Bishop Francesco Rossi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1974
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast