Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Sulumeti

Bishop Emeritus of Kakamega, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1937 Born
6 Jan 196628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kisumu, Kenya
28 May 197234.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kisumu, Kenya
28 May 197234.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Urci
20 Aug 197235.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urci
9 Dec 197639.3AppointedBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
28 Feb 197840.5AppointedBishop of Kakamega, Kenya
5 Dec 201477.3RetiredBishop of Kakamega, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Philip Sulumeti
Bishop Philip Sulumeti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kakamega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKotur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kakamega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast