Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Mahony, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ilorin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1919BornDerrybrien, Ireland
17 Jun 194728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
6 Dec 196041.6AppointedPrefect of Ilorin, Nigeria
29 May 196950.0AppointedBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
1 Aug 196950.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
20 Oct 198465.4ResignedBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
15 Nov 199475.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ilorin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for William Mahony:
Bishop William Mahony S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ilorin

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015